Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - City of Laurel - Sales by License Holders PG 308-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, in the City of Laurel, a license may be granted to sell alcoholic beverages in any building regardless of its distance from a place of worship.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0840 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283494/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714632/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments {283494/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {714632/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 63
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM