Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Branch, Carey, Davis, Glenn, S. Howard, Impallaria, Kramer, Lisanti, Mautz, Valderrama, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, under specified circumstances, an employer from failing or refusing to hire, discharging, or otherwise discriminating against an applicant or employee on the basis of the applicant's or employee's engagement in a lawful activity off the employer's premises during nonworking hours; authorizing an applicant or employee aggrieved by a violation of the Act to file a civil action against the employer to obtain specified relief; providing for a specified limitations period for filing an action under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0784
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM