Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Campos, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, C. Howard, Jalisi, Kaiser, Lam, Luedtke, McCray, Miele, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Smith, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, M. Washington, C. Wilson, Carey, Hammen, Bromwell, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, McMillan, Morgan, Pendergrass, Reznik, Rose, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, on or before December 31, 2017, a person that installs or operates a multiple-line telephone system ensures that the system is connected to the public switched telephone network in such a way that an individual dialing 9-1-1 is connected to the public safety answering point without requiring the individual to dial any other number or set of numbers; providing a specified exception for a unit of the Executive Branch of State government; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0576
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {126682/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {126682/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Finance 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM