Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects - Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Acevero, Boyce, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Moon, Stein, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying Coast Smart siting and design criteria to certain private construction or reconstruction projects beginning July 1, 2021; exempting certain private construction or reconstruction projects from the application of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects - Application
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page