Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Love, Minnick, and Schuh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the formula in accordance with which a title insurer domiciled in the State shall reduce the reserves applicable to specified contracts of title insurance for purposes of a statutory or unearned premium reserve; altering a provision of law relating to a certification that a title insurer is required to file with its annual report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0881
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923392/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {923392/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM