Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Public Schools - Reporting on Financial Management Practice Audits PG 423-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Chief Executive Officer of the Prince George's County public school system, in collaboration with the Prince George's County Board of Education, to report to the Prince George's County Delegation of the General Assembly, at the discretion of the Delegation, on specified issues relating to a specified financial management practices audit conducted by the Office of Legislative Audits.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM