Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Declaring that the General Assembly finds that 9-1-1 specialists are key members of the team of public safety personnel; repealing references to the term "9-1-1 public safety telecommunicator" and substituting references to the term "9-1-1 specialist" in certain provisions authorizing a certain property tax credit; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0284
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116586/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {116586/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Text - Chapter - 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM