Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on written request of a landowner in an application to purchase an easement, an easement to authorize the landowner to use the land subject to the easement for renewable energy generation under specified circumstances; requiring, on written request of a landowner, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to amend an easement to authorize the landowner to use the land subject to the easement for renewable energy generation under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0796
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-509, 2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM