Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Fees and Charges
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Metzgar, Platt, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Worker's Compensation Commission to adopt regulations about payment for the examination of a covered employee and the preparation of a report by a medical expert engaged by a party; authorizing the Commission to regulate fees and other charges for examinations and the preparation of reports by medical experts under specified provisions of law; and prohibiting specified fees and charges from varying based on the party responsible for paying the fee or charge.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0118
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM