Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage Law
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Minnick, Weir, Barnes, Braveboy, Frick, Healey, Hucker, Love, McHale, Mizeur, Murphy, Niemann, Vaughn, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage Law; providing for the membership and cochairs of the Task Force; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, with assistance from the Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation, to staff the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings on or before December 31, 2013, relating to the effect of the Maryland Prevailing Wage Law on school construction to the Governor and committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0290
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0368 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623299/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {393321/1 Rejected (41-89)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-44)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-38)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {623299/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {393321/1 Rejected (41-89) 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (92-44) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments {167976/1 Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (89-38) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM