Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, B. Barnes, Carr, Chang, Gaines, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Jackson, Jones, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, A. Miller, Reznik, Sophocleus, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, instead of requiring, an appropriation for the Commission for the Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship; establishing the Career and Technology Education Grant Program to provide grants for the capital equipping of school facilities used to provide a certain career and technology program; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement and administer the Program; terminating certain provisions of the Act after June 30, 2026; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0515
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations Ways and Means
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Reassigned to Appropriations Ways and Means 23
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3303, 5-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM