Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the contents of the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; authorizing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, in consultation with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner and as approved by the Board of Trustees of the Exchange, to submit a waiver under certain provisions of federal law as to allow the State to administer certain tax credit assistance to small businesses; and requiring the Exchange to determine whether the State needs a waiver to distribute certain tax credit assistance on a monthly basis to certain eligible employers.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {196483/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {196483/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-102, 31-107, 31-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM