Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Inspector General in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, or a designee of the Inspector General, to subpoena any person or evidence, administer oaths, and take depositions and other testimony for the purpose of investigating fraud, waste, or abuse of departmental health program funds; authorizing a specified court to take specified actions if a person fails to comply with a specified order or subpoena; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.3, 2-501, 2-503, 2-504.1, 2-504.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM