Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Schuh, Barnes, Braveboy, Burns, Feldman, Haddaway-Riccio, Hucker, Jameson, Kramer, Love, Minnick, and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the eligibility of qualifying biomass as a Tier 1 renewable source for the purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard to qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or after a specified date and that achieves a total system efficiency of 65% or more; providing that qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or before a specified date or that achieves not more than 65% of total system efficiency is eligible as a Tier 2 renewable source; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0684
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM