Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Oaks, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist or a pharmacy to decline to dispense a prescription drug or provide a pharmacy service to a member if the amount reimbursed by an insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization is less than the acquisition cost; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from reimbursing a pharmacy or pharmacist for a product or a pharmacy service in an amount less than a specified amount; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1055
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy Services
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1012, 15-1632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM