Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Zucker, Kelly, McIntosh, B. Barnes, Barve, Gaines, Hammen, Haynes, Hixson, Jones, A. Miller, Beitzel, Carozza, Chang, Ciliberti, Ghrist, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, McKay, B. Robinson, Sophocleus, Vogt, Wivell, P. Young, Kipke, and Szeliga
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force on the Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program to investigate ways to assist disabled individuals and their families to establish savings accounts to pay qualified expenses for specified disabled individuals; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; requiring the General Assembly to consider legislation proposed by the Task Force to establish an ABLE program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0761
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964961/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {259438/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Delegates Zucker, Sophocleus, and Carozza
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Senators Serafini, Guzzone, and Ferguson
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {964961/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {259438/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 53
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Delegates Zucker, Sophocleus, and Carozza 61
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Senators Serafini, Guzzone, and Ferguson 59
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM