Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for Relief and Timing of Prohibited Actions
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Bobo, Braveboy, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, and Hucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which relief may be provided to a tenant for a retaliatory action taken by a landlord of residential property by repealing the requirement that a specified number of judgments not have been entered against the tenant for possession for rent due and unpaid during a specified period prior to the initiation of the action; and extending the time, from 6 months to 12 months, after a tenant's protected action after which a landlord's alleged prohibited action may not be deemed to be retaliatory.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0800
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM