Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes and Long
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing all counties and municipal corporations to release liens for unpaid real property taxes or other charges and assessments to facilitate a transfer of real property if certain conditions are satisfied; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to withhold certain real property from tax sale under certain circumstances; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to sell certain abandoned property at tax sale for less than the total amount of certain taxes, interest and penalties, and expenses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {525165/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {133225/1 (Delegate Ali) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {525165/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 58
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {133225/1 (Delegate Ali) Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-806, 14-811, 14-817, 14-824, 14-833 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM