Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Depreciation Modification - First-Year Depreciation
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Branch, and A. Miller
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of a Maryland income tax modification for depreciation of property to provide an additional allowance equal to 100% of the adjusted basis of the property for the taxable year the property is placed in service; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning on or after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210.1, 10-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM