Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cosmetic Surgery - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an office or a facility in which a cosmetic surgical procedure is performed to be licensed as a freestanding ambulatory care facility; authorizing the State Board of Physicians to take specified disciplinary action against a licensee who performs a cosmetic surgical procedure without being approved through the credentialing process or participating in the practitioner performance evaluation process of the office or facility in which the cosmetic surgical procedure is performed; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0509
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-3B-01, 19-3B-02 )
(   14-101, 14-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM