Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease and Permanent Partial Disability - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Ciliberti, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the presumption of a compensable occupational disease under workers' compensation law to include Frederick County deputy sheriffs and correctional officers who suffer from heart disease or hypertension resulting in partial or total disability or death under certain circumstances; providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for Frederick County deputy sheriffs or correctional officers for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a certain number of weeks; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Frederick County - Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease and Permanent Partial Disability - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-503, 9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM