Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson, Barnes, Beitzel, Braveboy, Clagett, Holmes, James, Jameson, Jones, McIntosh, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Vitale, and Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to assist a child who has been identified as a victim of identity fraud to apply for an identity theft passport under specified circumstances; and requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to assist a child who has been identified as a victim of identity fraud to apply for an identity theft passport under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0388
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-305 )
(   5-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM