Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Authorized Turns on Red After Yielding
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Dwyer, Glass, Hogan, Jacobs, McDermott, McDonough, A. Miller, Otto, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception for specified authorized turns to the requirement that vehicular traffic facing a steady circular red signal stop at the near side of the intersection at specified points; and authorizing vehicular traffic facing a steady red signal to cautiously enter the intersection and make a right turn after yielding to any traffic coming from the left or a left turn from a one-way street onto another one-way street after yielding to any traffic coming from the right.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0834
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-202, 21-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM