Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Dumais, Gutierrez, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the maximum penalty for driving a motor vehicle while a person's license or privilege to drive is suspended under specified provisions of State law; altering the maximum penalty for driving a motor vehicle while a person's license or privilege to drive is suspended by another state under specified circumstances; and altering the maximum penalty for driving on a highway without a license.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {872318/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-49)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {872318/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (88-49) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM