Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Brooks, Ebersole, Guyton, Hettleman, Jalisi, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue bonds to finance the construction of or improvements to certain Baltimore County public school facilities and subject to certain limitations; specifying that the Authority and the Baltimore County Board of Education shall be responsible for certain public school facilities construction and improvement projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0758
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-628, 10-634, 10-649, 10-650, 10-658, 10-659 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM