Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Equality in Education Act PG 434-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a public charter school application for a public charter school located in Prince George's County to include specified information regarding whether public charter schools will provide transportation or secure a facility that is accessible to public transportation; requiring specified public charter schools to develop and implement a specified comprehensive plan; requiring specified public charter schools to submit a specified comprehensive plan to the Chief Executive Officer of Prince George's County Public Schools; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM