Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Barve, Branch, Ebersole, Jones, Kaiser, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; and authorizing the Commission to provide specified reports to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the Maryland Congressional Delegation under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0884
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993792/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {427571/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {433423/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-47)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {993792/1 Adopted 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Finance 42
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {427571/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Floor Amendment {433423/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 56
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-47) 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Text - Chapter - Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM