Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Military Dependents - In-State Tuition
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Buckel, and McKay
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting spouses and financially dependent children of active duty and retired members of the United States armed forces from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0018 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM