Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary Education - Prekindergarten Through Grade 2 State Assessments - Required Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Buckel, McKay, Afzali, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Luedtke, Metzgar, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education, in consultation with specified stakeholders, to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015, on specified matters related to the local school system assessments.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0699
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {215865/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {215865/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM