Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified entities to convert into other entities; establishing the manner of and procedures for conversions; requiring articles of conversion to be filed for record with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; specifying the contents of articles of conversion; providing for the effects of a conversion; providing for the timing of the effectiveness of articles of conversion and the effective time for the completion of a conversion; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0697
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983897/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {983897/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 46
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 47
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 48A
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 51
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 10-7A-01 through 10-7A-07, 1-101, 1-203, 12-1001 through 12-1007, 1-301, 3-202, 3-901 through 3-907, 4A-1101 through 4A-1107, 4A-1101 through 4A-1108, 4A-1201 through 4A-1203, 4A-206, 4A-403, 8-701, 8-701 through 8-707, 8-801, 9A-1201 through 9A-1205, 9A-1201 through 9A-1207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM