Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Carozza, Ciliberti, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, Krebs, Long, McKay, Otto, Reilly, Robinson, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain provisions of law exempting agricultural buildings used for agritourism from a certain permit requirement to apply statewide.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {370215/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {370215/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Bates) Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text - Chapter - Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM