Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Anderson, Anderton, B. Barnes, Fennell, Gaines, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Lam, Mautz, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, B. Robinson, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, and West
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a record owner of a specified new dwelling to claim a credit against the State income tax in an amount equal to $1.25 for each square foot of the new dwelling if a specified automatic fire sprinkler system is installed in the new dwelling; requiring the State Fire Marshal to approve applications for the credit in a specified manner; limiting the total amount of credits that may be approved to $1,000,000 in any taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0728
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM