Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Shopping Carts and Metal Piping
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Burns, Cane, Cardin, Carr, Conaway, Dwyer, Glenn, Hough, McConkey, Nathan-Pulliam, B. Robinson, Stukes, Swain, Tarrant, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a junk dealer or scrap metal processor from purchasing from an individual a shopping cart, flatbed cart, or similar wheeled device under specified circumstances, or copper or other metal piping unlawfully taken from a house; providing for penalties; requiring that a person be barred permanently from selling material to a junk dealer or scrap metal processor under specified circumstances; and providing for a defense against a specified action.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM