Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Locating Businesses in Libraries in Prince George's County PG 415-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Locating Businesses in Libraries in Prince George's County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; establishing the duties of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2014; terminating the Act at the end of December 31, 2014; etc.
Details
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565963/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments {565963/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM