Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Rates and Itemized Deductions
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Carozza, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Corderman, Grammer, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the State income tax rate on the Maryland taxable income of certain individuals; allowing an individual to itemize deductions to compute Maryland taxable income whether or not the individual itemizes deductions on the individual's federal income tax return; providing that, for an individual who does not itemize deductions on the individual's federal income tax return, Maryland itemized deductions shall be determined as if an individual itemized deductions on the federal income tax return; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Rates and Itemized Deductions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Rates and Itemized Deductions
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-217, 10-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM