Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of Disability
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a certain property tax credit in Washington County for the dwelling house of a disabled veteran or the surviving spouse of a disabled veteran to include veterans with any service-connected disability; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0887
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of Disability
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of Disability
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of Disability
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM