Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Records and Notice Concerning Medications Dispensed to Insureds
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each pharmacy benefits manager to maintain certain medication dispensing records for certain insureds and to notify certain pharmacists and prescribers of certain potential problems that the pharmacy benefits manager identifies.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Records and Notice Concerning Medications Dispensed to Insureds
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM