Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology - Funding
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to annually appropriate to the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology (CREST) an amount that is equivalent to the amount appropriated to a similar regional higher education center for specified purposes and, for fiscal years 2018 through 2020, is in addition to an amount that covers start-up costs incurred by Frederick CREST.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0874
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254863/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-16)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {254863/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (120-16) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1002, 24-1004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM