Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland Securities Act to regulate federal exempt broker-dealers; establishing the Securities Act Registration Fund to be used to administer and enforce the Act; altering the actions that are unlawful under the Maryland Securities Act; requiring specified individuals that believe that a specified adult is the subject of financial exploitation to notify the Commissioner within 5 days of developing a reasonable belief that financial exploitation exists or to provide immediate notification under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {833599/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {833599/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Text - Chapter - Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-208, 11-302, 11-306, 11-307, 11-401, 11-402, 11-405, 11-407, 11-411, 11-412, 11-418, 11-503.1, 11-506, 11-510.1, 11-601, 11-701.1, 11-702 )
(   14-101, 14-201, 14-302, 14-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM