Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Final Disposition of Unclaimed Bodies - Authorizing Agent (Nancy's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Glass, Hill, McKay, Metzgar, Moon, Shoemaker, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a relative or friend of a decedent is deemed, under specified circumstances, to be the authorizing agent for purposes of arranging for the final disposition of the decedent's unclaimed body; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-401, 5-406, 5-508, 5-509, 5-510, 5-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM