Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Examine Reinstatement of the Death Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Ciliberti, Glass, Jacobs, McKay, Otto, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Examine Reinstatement of the Death Penalty; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Examine Reinstatement of the Death Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Examine Reinstatement of the Death Penalty
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page