Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Parent Consent and Student Privacy
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Boteler, Cluster, Costa, Frank, Glass, Impallaria, Krebs, McConkey, McDermott, Myers, Norman, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Serafini, Stukes, Szeliga, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public school or county board of education to obtain specified data related to a student or family member of the student only from, or with the consent of, the parent or guardian of the student; requiring a public school or county board to obtain a specified written consent before storing specified student data in an electronic format; authorizing a parent or guardian of a student to choose not to have the student participate in a specified assessment if a specified written notice is provided; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-707, 7-121, 7-204.1, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM