Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Bilingual Certification and Instruction
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Haynes, Healey, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, Malone, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, on or before July 1, 2019, to establish a certain certification program for bilingual teachers; requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Board and the State Board of Education jointly to set certain standards and guidelines for the delivery of bilingual instruction by certain teacher preparation programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Bilingual Certification and Instruction
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-704.2, 6-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM