Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Products - Unpackaged Cigars and Flavored Other Tobacco Products - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified persons from purchasing, selling, distributing, holding for sale or distribution, or offering to sell or distribute to an individual an unpackaged cigar; prohibiting specified persons from holding for sale or distribution, offering for sale or distribution, or selling or distributing flavored other tobacco products; providing that a specified statement or claim constitutes specified evidence; providing for the prospective application the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0898
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-5B-01 through 11-5B-03, 11-5C-01 through 11-5C-03 )
(   10-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM