Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an owner of specified residential rental property to submit certifications and affidavits to the Department of the Environment in order to maintain an exemption from lead-based paint risk reduction standards; providing that an exemption for a multifamily rental dwelling expires on October 1, 2020, unless an inspection was conducted in accordance with regulations adopted by the Department; requiring an owner of a specified residential rental property to maintain a specified copy of each affidavit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550119/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {550119/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM