Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development Projects
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Expanding a specified property tax credit for specified business entities in Washington County to include specified business entities that invest at least $10,000,000 for capital improvements of specified real property and create 100 new and permanent full-time positions in Washington County; providing for the amount and duration of the property tax credit; making conforming changes; and providing for the application of the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0925
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM