Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicles - Salvage
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, Pena-Melnyk, and Lehman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the determination of when a vehicle is a salvage; altering the required contents of the statement an insurance company must provide when submitting an application for a salvage certificate; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to establish a vehicle value threshold for determining when a vehicle is a salvage; altering the criteria for when the Administration must issue a certificate of title for a vehicle that has been stolen and recovered; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Motor Vehicles - Salvage
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Motor Vehicles - Salvage
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 29
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-152, 13-506, 13-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM