Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, Mautz, and Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the amount of a credit against the State income tax is 50%, not to exceed $500,000, of the investment in a qualified Maryland cybersecurity company located in Allegany County, Dorchester County, Garrett County, or Somerset County; applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0681
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {989836/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Delegates M. Washington, Fennell, and Long
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senators Madaleno, Edwards, and Ferguson
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 63
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 61A
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {989836/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Delegates M. Washington, Fennell, and Long 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senators Madaleno, Edwards, and Ferguson 67
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM