Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Rights Tax Relief Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Barve, Cardin, Dumais, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lee, Mizeur, Niemann, Rosenberg, V. Turner, and Valderrama
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for payments received by a claimant for noneconomic damages as a result of specified claims of unlawful discrimination, other than amounts received for lost pay or punitive damages; defining specified terms; applying the Act to tax years after 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0639
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1091 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM