Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business
Sponsored by
Delegates F. Turner, Hixson, Beidle, Bohanan, Burns, DeBoy, Frush, Glass, Hammen, Healey, Hogan, Howard, Kaiser, Love, McDonough, McHale, Proctor, Ready, Rudolph, Stocksdale, and Stukes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified unemployed veteran a credit of up to $2,000 against the State income tax for expenses associated with starting a business during the taxable year; requiring the business to meet specified qualifications; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations and provide an annual report; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM